LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1397
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1397
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1397
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 10, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 19, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 31, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 21, 2021
Analysis
May 23, 2021
Analysis
March 27, 2021
Comm Sub
Bill
May 23, 2021
Compare
Bill
April 8, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 30, 2021