Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021