Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1444 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            S.B. No. 1444


 AN ACT
 relating to participation in the uniform group coverage program for
 active school employees and to a study concerning health coverage
 for school district employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1579.1045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1579.1045.  ALTERNATIVE GROUP HEALTH COVERAGE
 PROHIBITED. Notwithstanding any other law, a participating entity
 may not offer or make available to the entity's employees or their
 dependents group health coverage not provided under the program.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1579.155 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1579.155.  PROGRAM PARTICIPATION: ELECTION. (a)
 Effective September 1, 2022, a participating entity may elect to
 discontinue the entity's participation in the program by providing
 written notice to the trustee not later than December 31 of the year
 preceding the first day of the plan year in which the election will
 be effective.
 (b)  A participating entity that elects to discontinue
 participation in the program under Subsection (a) may not elect to:
 (1)  participate in the program until the fifth
 anniversary of the effective date of the entity's election to
 discontinue participation; or
 (2)  discontinue the entity's participation after an
 election described by Subdivision (1) until the fifth anniversary
 of the effective date of that election.
 (c)  Effective September 1, 2022, an entity that elects to
 participate in the program shall provide written notice to the
 trustee not later than December 31 of the year preceding the first
 day of the plan year in which the election will be effective. The
 entity may not elect to discontinue the entity's participation
 until the fifth anniversary of the effective date of the entity's
 election to participate.
 (d)  The trustee by rule shall prescribe the time and manner
 for making an election under this section and may adopt rules
 necessary to administer this section.
 SECTION 3.  (a) In this section, "committee" means a
 regional school district health coverage advisory committee
 established under this section.
 (b)  Each regional education service center established
 under Chapter 8, Education Code, shall establish a regional school
 district health coverage advisory committee to conduct a study
 assessing:
 (1)  health care needs of and health coverage options
 currently available to employees of school districts served by that
 service center; and
 (2)  alternative health coverage options that may be
 available.
 (c)  The executive director of each regional education
 service center shall serve as the chair of that region's committee.
 The executive director shall appoint nine superintendents of school
 districts served by the regional education service center to serve
 as members of that region's committee.
 (d)  The study must include, with respect to school districts
 in that committee's region, the following information:
 (1)  an overview of current health coverage plans made
 available to district employees, including for each plan:
 (A)  the amount paid by districts and by district
 employees for premium under the plan;
 (B)  the schedule of benefits available under the
 plan; and
 (C)  deductibles and other cost-sharing amounts
 applicable to services provided under the plan;
 (2)  a survey of district employees using a scale that
 allows the district employee to indicate that the employee is very
 satisfied, satisfied, somewhat satisfied, somewhat dissatisfied,
 dissatisfied, or very dissatisfied with:
 (A)  the current costs to the employee of the
 employee's health coverage plan; and
 (B)  benefits available and access to care under
 the employee's plan; and
 (3)  an assessment of three alternative health coverage
 options that are available on the open market or through
 self-funding of school district health care expenses, including for
 each alternative:
 (A)  the amount that would be paid by a district
 and district employees for premium under the alternative;
 (B)  the schedule of benefits available under the
 alternative; and
 (C)  whether, in obtaining the alternative, some
 or all of the districts in the region should jointly seek health
 coverage under that alternative as a group.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2022, each committee shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, each standing committee of the senate or
 house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over public
 education or public retirement systems, the commissioner of the
 Texas Education Agency, and the executive director of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas a written report on the study conducted
 by the committee under this section.
 (f)  This section expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 1579.1045 and 1579.155, Insurance Code,
 as added by this Act, apply only to group coverage provided for a
 plan year beginning on or after September 1, 2022. A plan year that
 begins before that date is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the Senate on
 May 6, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the House on
 May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor