Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1444 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1444
1+By: Taylor, et al. S.B. No. 1444
2+ (Bonnen)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to participation in the uniform group coverage program for
68 active school employees and to a study concerning health coverage
79 for school district employees.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
1012 amended by adding Section 1579.1045 to read as follows:
1113 Sec. 1579.1045. ALTERNATIVE GROUP HEALTH COVERAGE
1214 PROHIBITED. Notwithstanding any other law, a participating entity
1315 may not offer or make available to the entity's employees or their
1416 dependents group health coverage not provided under the program.
1517 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
1618 amended by adding Section 1579.155 to read as follows:
1719 Sec. 1579.155. PROGRAM PARTICIPATION: ELECTION. (a)
1820 Effective September 1, 2022, a participating entity may elect to
1921 discontinue the entity's participation in the program by providing
2022 written notice to the trustee not later than December 31 of the year
2123 preceding the first day of the plan year in which the election will
2224 be effective.
2325 (b) A participating entity that elects to discontinue
2426 participation in the program under Subsection (a) may not elect to:
2527 (1) participate in the program until the fifth
2628 anniversary of the effective date of the entity's election to
2729 discontinue participation; or
2830 (2) discontinue the entity's participation after an
2931 election described by Subdivision (1) until the fifth anniversary
3032 of the effective date of that election.
3133 (c) Effective September 1, 2022, an entity that elects to
3234 participate in the program shall provide written notice to the
3335 trustee not later than December 31 of the year preceding the first
3436 day of the plan year in which the election will be effective. The
3537 entity may not elect to discontinue the entity's participation
3638 until the fifth anniversary of the effective date of the entity's
3739 election to participate.
3840 (d) The trustee by rule shall prescribe the time and manner
3941 for making an election under this section and may adopt rules
4042 necessary to administer this section.
4143 SECTION 3. (a) In this section, "committee" means a
4244 regional school district health coverage advisory committee
4345 established under this section.
4446 (b) Each regional education service center established
4547 under Chapter 8, Education Code, shall establish a regional school
4648 district health coverage advisory committee to conduct a study
4749 assessing:
4850 (1) health care needs of and health coverage options
4951 currently available to employees of school districts served by that
5052 service center; and
5153 (2) alternative health coverage options that may be
5254 available.
5355 (c) The executive director of each regional education
5456 service center shall serve as the chair of that region's committee.
5557 The executive director shall appoint nine superintendents of school
5658 districts served by the regional education service center to serve
5759 as members of that region's committee.
5860 (d) The study must include, with respect to school districts
5961 in that committee's region, the following information:
6062 (1) an overview of current health coverage plans made
6163 available to district employees, including for each plan:
6264 (A) the amount paid by districts and by district
6365 employees for premium under the plan;
6466 (B) the schedule of benefits available under the
6567 plan; and
6668 (C) deductibles and other cost-sharing amounts
6769 applicable to services provided under the plan;
6870 (2) a survey of district employees using a scale that
6971 allows the district employee to indicate that the employee is very
7072 satisfied, satisfied, somewhat satisfied, somewhat dissatisfied,
7173 dissatisfied, or very dissatisfied with:
7274 (A) the current costs to the employee of the
7375 employee's health coverage plan; and
7476 (B) benefits available and access to care under
7577 the employee's plan; and
7678 (3) an assessment of three alternative health coverage
7779 options that are available on the open market or through
7880 self-funding of school district health care expenses, including for
7981 each alternative:
8082 (A) the amount that would be paid by a district
8183 and district employees for premium under the alternative;
8284 (B) the schedule of benefits available under the
8385 alternative; and
8486 (C) whether, in obtaining the alternative, some
8587 or all of the districts in the region should jointly seek health
8688 coverage under that alternative as a group.
8789 (e) Not later than November 1, 2022, each committee shall
8890 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
8991 house of representatives, each standing committee of the senate or
9092 house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over public
9193 education or public retirement systems, the commissioner of the
9294 Texas Education Agency, and the executive director of the Teacher
9395 Retirement System of Texas a written report on the study conducted
9496 by the committee under this section.
9597 (f) This section expires January 1, 2023.
9698 SECTION 4. Sections 1579.1045 and 1579.155, Insurance Code,
9799 as added by this Act, apply only to group coverage provided for a
98100 plan year beginning on or after September 1, 2022. A plan year that
99101 begins before that date is governed by the law as it existed
100102 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
101103 continued in effect for that purpose.
102104 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
103- ______________________________ ______________________________
104- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
105- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the Senate on
106- May 6, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
107- ______________________________
108- Secretary of the Senate
109- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the House on
110- May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one
111- present not voting.
112- ______________________________
113- Chief Clerk of the House
114- Approved:
115- ______________________________
116- Date
117- ______________________________
118- Governor