Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021