Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1575 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1575
1+By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1575
2+ (Oliverson, Johnson of Dallas, Hinojosa, Rose)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to assessment and oversight of children placed by the
68 Department of Family and Protective Services in a qualified
79 residential treatment program and a study regarding residential
810 treatment center placements.
911 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1012 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 263, Family Code, is
1113 amended by adding Section 263.00201 to read as follows:
1214 Sec. 263.00201. REVIEW OF PLACEMENT IN QUALIFIED
1315 RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "qualified
1416 residential treatment program" has the meaning assigned by 42
1517 U.S.C. Section 672(k)(4).
1618 (b) Not later than the 60th day after the date the
1719 department places a child in a qualified residential treatment
1820 program, a court shall:
1921 (1) consider any assessment, determination, and
2022 documentation made by a qualified individual in accordance with 42
2123 U.S.C. Section 675a(c) regarding the child's placement;
2224 (2) determine whether the child's needs can be met
2325 through placement in a foster home and, if not, whether:
2426 (A) placing the child in a qualified residential
2527 treatment program provides the most effective and appropriate level
2628 of care for the child in the least restrictive environment; and
2729 (B) placement in a qualified residential
2830 treatment program is consistent with the short-term and long-term
2931 goals for the child, as specified in the child's permanency plan;
3032 and
3133 (3) approve or disapprove the placement.
3234 (c) Any written documentation prepared for the review of the
3335 child's placement under this section and any documentation
3436 regarding the determination and approval or disapproval of the
3537 placement in a qualified residential treatment program by the court
3638 under Subsection (b) shall be included in and made part of the
3739 child's permanency plan.
3840 (d) As long as a child remains in a qualified residential
3941 treatment program, the department shall at the status review
4042 hearing and each permanency hearing held with respect to the child
4143 provide the court with information:
4244 (1) demonstrating that:
4345 (A) ongoing assessment of the strengths and needs
4446 of the child continues to support the determination that the needs
4547 of the child cannot be met through placement in a foster home;
4648 (B) placement in a qualified residential
4749 treatment program provides the most effective and appropriate level
4850 of care for the child in the least restrictive environment; and
4951 (C) the placement is consistent with the
5052 short-term and long-term goals for the child, as specified in the
5153 child's permanency plan;
5254 (2) documenting the specific treatment or service
5355 needs that will be met for the child in the placement and the length
5456 of time the child is expected to need the treatment or services; and
5557 (3) documenting the efforts made by the department to
5658 prepare the child to return home or to be placed in a foster home or
5759 with a fit and willing relative, legal guardian, or adoptive
5860 parent.
5961 (e) The department may include the information required by
6062 Subsection (d) in any report the department is required to provide
6163 to the court before the hearing.
6264 (f) The review of a child's placement in a qualified
6365 residential treatment program may be conducted through a remote
6466 proceeding. For purposes of this subsection, "remote proceeding"
6567 means a proceeding before a court in which one or more of the
6668 participants, including a judge, party, attorney, witness, court
6769 reporter, child, or other individual, attends the proceeding
6870 remotely through the use of technology and the Internet.
6971 SECTION 2. Section 264.018(a)(5), Family Code, is amended
7072 to read as follows:
7173 (5) "Significant event" means:
7274 (A) a placement change, including failure by the
7375 department to locate an appropriate placement for at least one
7476 night;
7577 (B) a significant change in medical condition;
7678 (C) an initial prescription of a psychotropic
7779 medication or a change in dosage of a psychotropic medication;
7880 (D) a major change in school performance or a
7981 serious disciplinary event at school; [or]
8082 (E) a placement in a qualified residential
8183 treatment program as that term is defined by 42 U.S.C. Section
8284 672(k)(4); or
8385 (F) any event determined to be significant under
8486 department rule.
8587 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
8688 amended by adding Section 264.1077 to read as follows:
8789 Sec. 264.1077. STUDY REGARDING RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT
8890 CENTER PLACEMENT. (a) The Supreme Court of Texas Children's
8991 Commission, in collaboration with the department, shall establish
9092 and oversee a work group to examine the oversight of and best
9193 practices related to residential treatment center placements,
9294 including placements in qualified residential treatment programs
9395 as that term is defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 672(k)(4). The work
9496 group shall consider topics and changes to current practices the
9597 work group determines necessary to ensure the appropriate use of
9698 and to improve the transition into and out of residential treatment
9799 center placements, including:
98100 (1) statutorily required judicial review of
99101 residential treatment center placements;
100102 (2) fiscal implications of additional judicial review
101103 for residential treatment center placements;
102104 (3) methods for improving the state's practices
103105 regarding the duration of residential treatment center placements,
104106 including best practices for transition planning and involving
105107 family and other relevant participants in preparing the child for a
106108 subsequent placement;
107109 (4) proposed statutory changes regarding appropriate
108110 judicial findings, evidence required to be submitted by the
109111 department, and recommendations for information to be gathered from
110112 the child's attorney or guardian ad litem; and
111113 (5) model court orders determined to be appropriate
112114 for the legal requirements for a particular placement.
113115 (b) Not later than October 1, 2022, the Supreme Court of
114116 Texas Children's Commission shall submit a report to the
115117 legislature regarding the findings and recommendations from the
116118 work group established by Subsection (a).
117119 (c) This section expires September 1, 2023.
118120 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
119- ______________________________ ______________________________
120- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
121- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1575 passed the Senate on
122- May 5, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
123- ______________________________
124- Secretary of the Senate
125- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1575 passed the House on
126- May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, two
127- present not voting.
128- ______________________________
129- Chief Clerk of the House
130- Approved:
131- ______________________________
132- Date
133- ______________________________
134- Governor