Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1575 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1575


 AN ACT
 relating to assessment and oversight of children placed by the
 Department of Family and Protective Services in a qualified
 residential treatment program and a study regarding residential
 treatment center placements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 263, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 263.00201 to read as follows:
 Sec. 263.00201.  REVIEW OF PLACEMENT IN QUALIFIED
 RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT PROGRAM. (a)  In this section, "qualified
 residential treatment program" has the meaning assigned by 42
 U.S.C. Section 672(k)(4).
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the date the
 department places a child in a qualified residential treatment
 program, a court shall:
 (1)  consider any assessment, determination, and
 documentation made by a qualified individual in accordance with 42
 U.S.C. Section 675a(c) regarding the child's placement;
 (2)  determine whether the child's needs can be met
 through placement in a foster home and, if not, whether:
 (A)  placing the child in a qualified residential
 treatment program provides the most effective and appropriate level
 of care for the child in the least restrictive environment; and
 (B)  placement in a qualified residential
 treatment program is consistent with the short-term and long-term
 goals for the child, as specified in the child's permanency plan;
 and
 (3)  approve or disapprove the placement.
 (c)  Any written documentation prepared for the review of the
 child's placement under this section and any documentation
 regarding the determination and approval or disapproval of the
 placement in a qualified residential treatment program by the court
 under Subsection (b) shall be included in and made part of the
 child's permanency plan.
 (d)  As long as a child remains in a qualified residential
 treatment program, the department shall at the status review
 hearing and each permanency hearing held with respect to the child
 provide the court with information:
 (1)  demonstrating that:
 (A)  ongoing assessment of the strengths and needs
 of the child continues to support the determination that the needs
 of the child cannot be met through placement in a foster home;
 (B)  placement in a qualified residential
 treatment program provides the most effective and appropriate level
 of care for the child in the least restrictive environment; and
 (C)  the placement is consistent with the
 short-term and long-term goals for the child, as specified in the
 child's permanency plan;
 (2)  documenting the specific treatment or service
 needs that will be met for the child in the placement and the length
 of time the child is expected to need the treatment or services; and
 (3)  documenting the efforts made by the department to
 prepare the child to return home or to be placed in a foster home or
 with a fit and willing relative, legal guardian, or adoptive
 parent.
 (e)  The department may include the information required by
 Subsection (d) in any report the department is required to provide
 to the court before the hearing.
 (f)  The review of a child's placement in a qualified
 residential treatment program may be conducted through a remote
 proceeding.  For purposes of this subsection, "remote proceeding"
 means a proceeding before a court in which one or more of the
 participants, including a judge, party, attorney, witness, court
 reporter, child, or other individual, attends the proceeding
 remotely through the use of technology and the Internet.
 SECTION 2.  Section 264.018(a)(5), Family Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (5)  "Significant event" means:
 (A)  a placement change, including failure by the
 department to locate an appropriate placement for at least one
 night;
 (B)  a significant change in medical condition;
 (C)  an initial prescription of a psychotropic
 medication or a change in dosage of a psychotropic medication;
 (D)  a major change in school performance or a
 serious disciplinary event at school; [or]
 (E)  a placement in a qualified residential
 treatment program as that term is defined by 42 U.S.C. Section
 672(k)(4); or
 (F)  any event determined to be significant under
 department rule.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.1077 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.1077.  STUDY REGARDING RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT
 CENTER PLACEMENT. (a) The Supreme Court of Texas Children's
 Commission, in collaboration with the department, shall establish
 and oversee a work group to examine the oversight of and best
 practices related to residential treatment center placements,
 including placements in qualified residential treatment programs
 as that term is defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 672(k)(4).  The work
 group shall consider topics and changes to current practices the
 work group determines necessary to ensure the appropriate use of
 and to improve the transition into and out of residential treatment
 center placements, including:
 (1)  statutorily required judicial review of
 residential treatment center placements;
 (2)  fiscal implications of additional judicial review
 for residential treatment center placements;
 (3)  methods for improving the state's practices
 regarding the duration of residential treatment center placements,
 including best practices for transition planning and involving
 family and other relevant participants in preparing the child for a
 subsequent placement;
 (4)  proposed statutory changes regarding appropriate
 judicial findings, evidence required to be submitted by the
 department, and recommendations for information to be gathered from
 the child's attorney or guardian ad litem; and
 (5)  model court orders determined to be appropriate
 for the legal requirements for a particular placement.
 (b)  Not later than October 1, 2022, the Supreme Court of
 Texas Children's Commission shall submit a report to the
 legislature regarding the findings and recommendations from the
 work group established by Subsection (a).
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1575 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1575 passed the House on
 May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 1, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor