Senate | 04/20/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |