Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1763 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/20/2021

                            By: Springer S.B. No. 1763
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Governor's EMS and Trauma
 Advisory Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 773.012(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The advisory council is composed of the following 20
 [19] members appointed by the governor:
 (1)  a board-certified emergency physician, appointed
 from a list of names recommended by a statewide professional
 association of emergency physicians;
 (2)  a licensed physician who is an emergency medical
 services medical director, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
 medical services medical directors;
 (3)  a registered nurse, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
 nurses;
 (4)  a fire chief for a municipality that provides
 emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide fire chiefs association;
 (5)  an officer or employee of a private provider of
 emergency medical services who is involved with the development of
 a Texas Trauma System, appointed from a list of names recommended by
 a statewide association of private providers of emergency medical
 services;
 (6)  a volunteer who provides emergency medical
 services, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
 association of volunteers;
 (7)  an educator in the field of emergency medical
 services;
 (8)  a member of an emergency medical services air
 medical team or unit, appointed from a list of names recommended by
 a statewide emergency medical services air medical association;
 (9)  a representative of a fire department that
 provides emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide association of firefighters;
 (10)  a representative of hospitals who is affiliated
 with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in an urban
 community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
 statewide association of hospitals;
 (11)  a representative of hospitals, who is affiliated
 with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in a rural
 community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
 statewide association of hospitals;
 (12)  a representative of a county provider of
 emergency medical services;
 (13)  one licensed physician who is a pediatrician with
 trauma or emergency care expertise;
 (14)  one trauma surgeon;
 (15)  one registered nurse with trauma expertise;
 (16)  a representative of a stand-alone emergency
 medical services agency in a municipality or taxing district,
 appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
 association representing emergency medical services agencies;
 (17)  a certified paramedic, appointed from a list of
 names recommended by a statewide association representing
 emergency medical services agencies or emergency medical services
 personnel; [and]
 (18)  a representative of an ambulatory surgical
 center, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
 association representing ambulatory surgical centers; and
 (19)  two representatives of the general public who are
 not qualified to serve under another subdivision of this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the governor
 shall appoint the member of the council as required by Section
 773.012(b)(18), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *