Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1763 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+87R8727 EAS-D
12 By: Springer S.B. No. 1763
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4- April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
5- Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to the composition of the Governor's EMS and Trauma
128 Advisory Council.
139 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1410 SECTION 1. Section 773.012(b), Health and Safety Code, is
1511 amended to read as follows:
1612 (b) The advisory council is composed of the following 20
1713 [19] members appointed by the governor:
1814 (1) a board-certified emergency physician, appointed
1915 from a list of names recommended by a statewide professional
2016 association of emergency physicians;
2117 (2) a licensed physician who is an emergency medical
2218 services medical director, appointed from a list of names
2319 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
2420 medical services medical directors;
2521 (3) a registered nurse, appointed from a list of names
2622 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
2723 nurses;
2824 (4) a fire chief for a municipality that provides
2925 emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
3026 recommended by a statewide fire chiefs association;
3127 (5) an officer or employee of a private provider of
3228 emergency medical services who is involved with the development of
3329 a Texas Trauma System, appointed from a list of names recommended by
3430 a statewide association of private providers of emergency medical
3531 services;
3632 (6) a volunteer who provides emergency medical
3733 services, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
3834 association of volunteers;
3935 (7) an educator in the field of emergency medical
4036 services;
4137 (8) a member of an emergency medical services air
4238 medical team or unit, appointed from a list of names recommended by
4339 a statewide emergency medical services air medical association;
4440 (9) a representative of a fire department that
4541 provides emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
4642 recommended by a statewide association of firefighters;
4743 (10) a representative of hospitals who is affiliated
4844 with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in an urban
4945 community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
5046 statewide association of hospitals;
5147 (11) a representative of hospitals, who is affiliated
5248 with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in a rural
5349 community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
5450 statewide association of hospitals;
5551 (12) a representative of a county provider of
5652 emergency medical services;
5753 (13) one licensed physician who is a pediatrician with
5854 trauma or emergency care expertise;
5955 (14) one trauma surgeon;
6056 (15) one registered nurse with trauma expertise;
6157 (16) a representative of a stand-alone emergency
6258 medical services agency in a municipality or taxing district,
6359 appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
6460 association representing emergency medical services agencies;
6561 (17) a certified paramedic, appointed from a list of
6662 names recommended by a statewide association representing
6763 emergency medical services agencies or emergency medical services
6864 personnel; [and]
6965 (18) a representative of an ambulatory surgical
7066 center, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
7167 association representing ambulatory surgical centers; and
7268 (19) two representatives of the general public who are
7369 not qualified to serve under another subdivision of this
7470 subsection.
7571 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2021, the governor
7672 shall appoint the member of the council as required by Section
7773 773.012(b)(18), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
7874 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7975 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8076 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8177 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8278 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
83- * * * * *