Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021