Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1941 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1941


 AN ACT
 relating to a strategic plan to address hyperemesis gravidarum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 32.047 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.047.  HYPEREMESIS GRAVIDARUM STRATEGIC PLAN. (a)
 In this section, "hyperemesis gravidarum" means a disorder that
 causes a woman to experience extreme, persistent nausea and
 vomiting during pregnancy that may lead to dehydration, weight
 loss, or electrolyte imbalance.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and implement a five-year
 strategic plan to improve the diagnosis and treatment of and raise
 public awareness of hyperemesis gravidarum. Not later than
 September 1 of the last state fiscal year in each five-year period,
 the commission shall develop a new strategic plan for the next five
 state fiscal years that begins with the following state fiscal
 year.
 (c)  The strategic plan must provide strategies to:
 (1)  increase awareness among state-administered
 program providers who may serve women at risk of or experiencing
 hyperemesis gravidarum about the prevalence and effects of
 hyperemesis gravidarum on outcomes for women and children;
 (2)  establish a referral network of community-based
 health care providers and support services addressing hyperemesis
 gravidarum;
 (3)  increase women's access to formal and informal
 peer support services, including access to certified peer
 specialists who have successfully completed additional training
 related to hyperemesis gravidarum;
 (4)  raise public awareness of hyperemesis gravidarum;
 and
 (5)  leverage sources of funding to support existing
 community-based hyperemesis gravidarum screening, referral,
 treatment, and support services.
 (d)  The commission shall coordinate with the department and
 the statewide health coordinating council in the development of the
 strategic plan.
 (e)  The commission, in consultation with the department and
 the statewide health coordinating council, shall annually review
 the strategic plan and update the plan as necessary.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2022, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall develop the initial strategic plan
 required by Section 32.047, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1941 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1941 passed the House on
 May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 107, Nays 40, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor