Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2054 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 2054


 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of fees and costs associated with driver
 education and safety courses and driver's license examinations for
 foster children or youth, former foster children or youth, and
 youth experiencing homelessness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.168 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.168.  PAYMENT OF FEES FOR CERTAIN FOSTER AND
 HOMELESS CHILDREN AND YOUTHS. (a) Unless prohibited under Section
 521.4265(c), the Texas Workforce Commission shall on request pay
 the fees associated with meeting a requirement imposed under this
 subchapter or Chapter 1001, Education Code, for a person who is:
 (1)  eligible for a driver's license fee exemption
 under Section 521.1811; or
 (2)  younger than 26 years of age and:
 (A)  was in the managing conservatorship of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services on the day before the
 person's 18th birthday; or
 (B)  is a homeless child or youth as defined by 42
 U.S.C. Section 11434a.
 (b)  The Texas Workforce Commission by rule shall establish a
 process by which:
 (1)  a person described by Subsection (a) may apply to
 that commission for the payment of fees under this section; and
 (2)  that commission pays fees associated with meeting
 a requirement imposed under this subchapter or Chapter 1001,
 Education Code, to appropriate entities on behalf of the person
 described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.4265, Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (b)  From the money in the identification fee exemption
 account the department shall:
 (1)  request that the comptroller transfer to the Texas
 Workforce Commission amounts sufficient to cover the cost of
 implementing the program under Section 521.168, including amounts
 sufficient for the payment by the Texas Workforce Commission of:
 (A)  fees to entities other than the department;
 and
 (B)  the Texas Workforce Commission's
 implementation costs; and
 (2)  for [For] each exemption granted under Section
 521.1015 or 521.1811, [the department shall] deposit to the credit
 of the Texas mobility fund an amount [from the identification fee
 exemption account under Subsection (a)] that is equal to the amount
 of the waived fee that would otherwise be deposited to the mobility
 fund.
 (c)  The department may not:
 (1)  request a transfer under Subsection (b)(1) if the
 balance of the account for the fiscal year is less than three times
 the amount expended in the previous fiscal year for the waivers
 provided by Sections 521.1015(e) and 521.1811; or
 (2)  grant an exemption under Section 521.1015 or
 521.1811 if money is not available in the identification fee
 exemption account to meet the requirements of Subsection (b)(2)
 [(b)].
 (d)  The department, in consultation with the Texas
 Workforce Commission, by rule shall establish a process by which
 transfers are made under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2054 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2054 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 7, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor