Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021