House | 05/23/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |