|
06/18/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1308
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 1-Tinderholt and S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/23/21 2:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Amended 1-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Postponed 5/20/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|