Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 30, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021