Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2212 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    S.B. No. 2212


 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of a peace officer to request and render aid
 for an injured person.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.33 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.33.  DUTY TO REQUEST AND RENDER AID. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a peace officer who encounters an
 injured person while discharging the officer's official duties
 shall immediately and as necessary:
 (1)  request emergency medical services personnel to
 provide the person with emergency medical services; and
 (2)  while waiting for emergency medical services
 personnel to arrive, provide first aid or treatment to the person to
 the extent of the officer's skill and training.
 (b)  The peace officer is not required to request emergency
 medical services or provide first aid or treatment under Subsection
 (a) if:
 (1)  making the request or providing the treatment
 would expose the officer or another person to a risk of bodily
 injury; or
 (2)  the officer is injured and physically unable to
 make the request or provide the treatment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2212 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2212 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor