Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis March 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021