Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB224 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 224


 AN ACT
 relating to simplified certification and recertification
 requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition
 assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.015(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In administering the supplemental nutrition assistance
 program, the commission shall, except as provided by Subsection (c)
 and Section 33.019, allow a person to comply with initial
 eligibility requirements, including any initial interview, and
 with subsequent periodic eligibility recertification requirements
 by telephone instead of through a personal appearance at commission
 offices if:
 (1)  the person and each member of the person's
 household:
 (A)  have no earned income; and
 (B)  are elderly or persons with disabilities; or
 (2)  the person is subject to a hardship, as determined
 by commission rule.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.019.  SIMPLIFIED CERTIFICATION AND RECERTIFICATION
 REQUIREMENTS FOR CERTAIN SNAP APPLICANTS AND RECIPIENTS. (a)  The
 commission shall develop and implement simplified certification
 and recertification requirements for supplemental nutrition
 assistance program benefits for an individual who:
 (1)  is 60 years of age or older or is a person with a
 disability, as determined by commission rule;
 (2)  has no earned income; and
 (3)  resides in a household in which every individual
 residing in the household is 60 years of age or older or is a person
 with a disability, as determined by commission rule.
 (b)  The simplified requirements must:
 (1)  allow an individual described by this section to
 waive recertification interview requirements;
 (2)  simplify and reduce the number of verification
 requirements for certifying and recertifying eligibility to
 receive benefits, which must include the use of a shortened
 application form; and
 (3)  allow the individual to remain eligible for
 benefits for 36 months after certification and after each
 recertification.
 (c)  An individual described by this section is required to:
 (1)  submit to the commission a change reporting form
 every 12 months during the 36-month eligibility period; and
 (2)  report to the commission, in accordance with
 federal law, when the individual receives an increase in income.
 (d)  The commission shall, in a manner that complies with
 federal law, use data matching to inform eligible individuals
 described by this section who are receiving Medicaid benefits of
 their eligibility for supplemental nutrition assistance program
 benefits.
 SECTION 3.  Section 33.019, Human Resources Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to an application or recertification of
 eligibility of a person for supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits submitted on or after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 224 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 224 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117,
 Nays 28, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor