Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB224 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 224
1+By: Perry, et al. S.B. No. 224
2+ (Walle, Meza, Morales of Maverick, Ortega)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to simplified certification and recertification
68 requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition
79 assistance program.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Section 33.015(a), Human Resources Code, is
1012 amended to read as follows:
1113 (a) In administering the supplemental nutrition assistance
1214 program, the commission shall, except as provided by Subsection (c)
1315 and Section 33.019, allow a person to comply with initial
1416 eligibility requirements, including any initial interview, and
1517 with subsequent periodic eligibility recertification requirements
1618 by telephone instead of through a personal appearance at commission
1719 offices if:
1820 (1) the person and each member of the person's
1921 household:
2022 (A) have no earned income; and
2123 (B) are elderly or persons with disabilities; or
2224 (2) the person is subject to a hardship, as determined
2325 by commission rule.
2426 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
2527 is amended by adding Section 33.019 to read as follows:
2628 Sec. 33.019. SIMPLIFIED CERTIFICATION AND RECERTIFICATION
2729 REQUIREMENTS FOR CERTAIN SNAP APPLICANTS AND RECIPIENTS. (a) The
2830 commission shall develop and implement simplified certification
2931 and recertification requirements for supplemental nutrition
3032 assistance program benefits for an individual who:
3133 (1) is 60 years of age or older or is a person with a
32- disability, as determined by commission rule;
33- (2) has no earned income; and
34- (3) resides in a household in which every individual
34+ disability, as determined by commission rule; and
35+ (2) resides in a household in which every individual
3536 residing in the household is 60 years of age or older or is a person
3637 with a disability, as determined by commission rule.
3738 (b) The simplified requirements must:
3839 (1) allow an individual described by this section to
3940 waive recertification interview requirements;
4041 (2) simplify and reduce the number of verification
4142 requirements for certifying and recertifying eligibility to
4243 receive benefits, which must include the use of a shortened
4344 application form; and
4445 (3) allow the individual to remain eligible for
4546 benefits for 36 months after certification and after each
4647 recertification.
4748 (c) An individual described by this section is required to:
4849 (1) submit to the commission a change reporting form
4950 every 12 months during the 36-month eligibility period; and
5051 (2) report to the commission, in accordance with
5152 federal law, when the individual receives an increase in income.
5253 (d) The commission shall, in a manner that complies with
53- federal law, use data matching to inform eligible individuals
54- described by this section who are receiving Medicaid benefits of
55- their eligibility for supplemental nutrition assistance program
56- benefits.
54+ federal law, use data matching to help enroll in the supplemental
55+ nutrition assistance program eligible individuals described by
56+ this section who are receiving Medicaid benefits. The commission
57+ may seek or use private funding or contract with a public or private
58+ entity to carry out this section.
5759 SECTION 3. Section 33.019, Human Resources Code, as added
5860 by this Act, applies only to an application or recertification of
5961 eligibility of a person for supplemental nutrition assistance
6062 program benefits submitted on or after January 1, 2022.
6163 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
6264 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
6365 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
6466 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
6567 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
6668 waiver or authorization is granted.
6769 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
68- ______________________________ ______________________________
69- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 224 passed the Senate on
71- April 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
72- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
73- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
74- ______________________________
75- Secretary of the Senate
76- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 224 passed the House, with
77- amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117,
78- Nays 28, one present not voting.
79- ______________________________
80- Chief Clerk of the House
81- Approved:
82- ______________________________
83- Date
84- ______________________________
85- Governor