|
06/01/2021
|
Effective on 1/1/22
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1764
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1437
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1436
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 14-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1435
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 13-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amended 12-Moody and Schofield
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1434
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 11-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1433
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Bernal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1432
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 9-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1431
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1430
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-J.E. Johnson, Zwiener, Talarico, Canales, Israel, Reynolds, Lopez, Ortega, Howard, Anchia, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1429
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Cole
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1428
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1427
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote RV#1426
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Beckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Israel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1408
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 7-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1407
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1406
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1405
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1404
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1403
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Israel
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended 1-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/24/21 6:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|