Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021