Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB23 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 23


 AN ACT
 relating to an election to approve a reduction or reallocation of
 funding or resources for certain county law enforcement agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 120 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 120. ELECTION FOR REDUCTION OF FUNDING OR RESOURCES FOR
 CERTAIN PRIMARY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES
 Sec. 120.001.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
 a county with a population of more than one million.
 Sec. 120.002.  ELECTION REQUIRED. (a) Except as provided by
 Section 120.003, a county shall hold an election in accordance with
 this chapter if the county adopts a budget for a fiscal year that,
 compared to the budget adopted by the county for the preceding
 fiscal year:
 (1)  reduces for a law enforcement agency, excluding a
 9-1-1 call center, with primary responsibility for policing,
 criminal investigation, and answering calls for service:
 (A)  for a fiscal year in which the overall amount
 of the budget is equal to or greater than the amount for the
 preceding fiscal year, the appropriation to the agency;
 (B)  for a fiscal year in which the overall amount
 of the budget is less than the amount for the preceding fiscal year,
 the appropriation to the agency as a percentage of the total budget;
 (C)  as applicable:
 (i)  if the county has not declined in
 population since the preceding fiscal year, the number of peace
 officer positions, excluding detention officer positions; or
 (ii)  if the county has declined in
 population since the preceding fiscal year, the number of peace
 officer positions, excluding detention officer positions, the law
 enforcement agency is authorized to employ per 1,000 county
 residents; or
 (D)  the amount of funding per peace officer for
 the recruitment and training of new peace officers to fill vacant
 and new peace officer positions in the agency; or
 (2)  reallocates funding or resources to another law
 enforcement agency.
 (b)  A county may not implement a proposed reduction or
 reallocation described by Subsection (a) until the county receives
 voter approval for the proposed reduction or reallocation at an
 election held for that purpose. The county may, at any time, order
 the election to be held on the 30th day after the date the county
 orders the election. Section 41.001, Election Code, does not apply
 to an election under this subsection.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, a county budget does not
 include:
 (1)  a one-time extraordinary expense, as determined by
 the comptroller, that is outside the normal costs of operating a law
 enforcement agency, including purchasing a fleet of law enforcement
 vehicles or constructing an additional training academy;
 (2)  revenues used to repay voter-approved bonded
 indebtedness incurred for a law enforcement purpose;
 (3)  detention officer compensation; or
 (4)  a donation or state or federal grant to the
 county's law enforcement agency.
 Sec. 120.003.  DISASTER EXCEPTION. Section 120.002 does not
 apply to a county budget adopted for a fiscal year in which, or the
 two fiscal years following the fiscal year in which, a significant
 budget reduction from the preceding fiscal year was caused by a
 disaster, including a tornado, hurricane, flood, wildfire, or other
 calamity, but not including a drought, epidemic, or pandemic, in an
 area of the county that was the subject of a disaster declaration by
 the governor under Chapter 418, Government Code, or by the
 president of the United States.
 Sec. 120.004.  BALLOT PROPOSITION REQUIREMENTS. A county
 holding an election under this chapter shall ensure that the ballot
 proposition for the election includes, as applicable:
 (1)  a detailed explanation of each proposed reduction;
 (2)  the amount of each proposed reduction;
 (3)  the recipient of reallocated funding or resources;
 (4)  the impact on the local tax rate, if any; and
 (5)  the expected length of time that the proposed
 reduction or reallocation will remain in effect.
 Sec. 120.005.  USE OF PUBLIC MONEY FOR CAMPAIGN PROHIBITED.
 A county holding an election under this chapter may not use public
 money on promotional campaigns or advocacy related to the proposed
 reduction or reallocation. This section may not be construed to
 prevent a county official or employee from communicating factual
 information about a proposed budget or the reasoning behind a
 proposed budget to the voters in the county.
 Sec. 120.006.  COMPLAINT. (a) A person who believes that a
 county has implemented a proposed reduction or reallocation
 described by Section 120.002(a) without the required voter approval
 and who resides in the county may file a complaint with the criminal
 justice division of the office of the governor.
 (b)  The criminal justice division of the office of the
 governor shall determine whether a complaint filed under Subsection
 (a) is potentially valid or frivolous or false.
 (c)  The criminal justice division of the office of the
 governor shall provide written notice of a potentially valid
 complaint filed under Subsection (a) to the county that is the
 subject of the complaint. The division shall provide the county an
 opportunity to correct the action that is the subject of the
 complaint before referring the complaint to the comptroller.
 Sec. 120.007.  COMPTROLLER INVESTIGATION; TAX RATE
 LIMITATION. (a) On request by the criminal justice division of the
 office of the governor, the comptroller shall determine whether a
 county has implemented a proposed reduction or reallocation
 described by Section 120.002(a) without the required voter
 approval. The comptroller shall issue a written determination to
 the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and governing body of the county.
 (b)  The comptroller may require a county to submit
 information for the current or preceding fiscal year to assist the
 comptroller's investigation under this section.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, if the comptroller
 determines that a county implemented a proposed reduction or
 reallocation described by Section 120.002(a) without the required
 voter approval, the county may not adopt an ad valorem tax rate that
 exceeds the county's no-new-revenue tax rate until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the comptroller issues a written
 determination that the county has, as applicable:
 (A)  reversed each funding reduction, adjusted
 for inflation, and personnel reduction that was a subject of the
 determination; or
 (B)  restored all reallocated funding and
 resources that were subjects of the determination to the original
 law enforcement agency; or
 (2)  the date on which each reduction and reallocation
 that was a subject of the determination has been approved in an
 election held in accordance with this chapter.
 (d)  For purposes of making the calculation required under
 Section 26.013, Tax Code, in a tax year the comptroller determines
 that a county implemented a proposed reduction or reallocation
 described by Section 120.002(a) without the required voter
 approval, the difference between the actual tax rate and
 voter-approval tax rate is considered to be zero.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 23 passed the Senate on
 April 13, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2, one
 present not voting; May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House
 amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2021, House granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021,
 Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following
 vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 23 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 86,
 Nays 59, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 112, Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor