Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB230 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/13/2021

                            S.B. No. 230


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuing education requirement for county
 commissioners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 81.0025(a) and (b), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A county commissioner must successfully complete at
 least 16 [classroom] hours of continuing education in the
 performance of the duties of county commissioners at least once in
 each 12-month period.
 (b)  Continuing education instruction required by this
 section must be certified by an accredited public institution of
 higher education.  The instruction may be completed online with the
 approval of the commissioners court, except a county commissioner
 must complete the instruction in person in the first 12-month
 period of the commissioner's first term.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 230 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 230 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120,
 Nays 19, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor