Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021