Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021