4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the use of hypnotically induced statements in a |
---|
6 | 8 | | criminal trial. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Article 38.24 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Art. 38.24. STATEMENTS OBTAINED BY INVESTIGATIVE HYPNOSIS. |
---|
11 | 13 | | (a) In this article, "investigative hypnosis" means a technique |
---|
12 | 14 | | that uses hypnosis to explore the memory of a witness to enhance the |
---|
13 | 15 | | witness's recall of a legally relevant event, including |
---|
14 | 16 | | descriptions of people, conversations, and the environment. |
---|
15 | | - | (b) This article applies to all statements made during or |
---|
16 | | - | after a hypnotic session by a person who has undergone |
---|
17 | | - | investigative hypnosis for the purpose of enhancing the person's |
---|
18 | | - | recollection of an event at issue in a criminal investigation or |
---|
19 | | - | case, including courtroom testimony regarding those statements and |
---|
20 | | - | including statements identifying an accused that are made pursuant |
---|
21 | | - | to pretrial identification procedures. |
---|
| 17 | + | (b) This article applies to all statements made during a |
---|
| 18 | + | hypnotic session by a person who has undergone investigative |
---|
| 19 | + | hypnosis for the purpose of enhancing the person's recollection of |
---|
| 20 | + | an event at issue in a criminal investigation or case, including |
---|
| 21 | + | courtroom testimony regarding those statements and including |
---|
| 22 | + | statements identifying an accused that are made pursuant to |
---|
| 23 | + | pretrial identification procedures. |
---|
28 | 30 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to the |
---|
29 | 31 | | admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that |
---|
30 | 32 | | commences on or after the effective date of this Act. The |
---|
31 | 33 | | admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that |
---|
32 | 34 | | commences before the effective date of this Act is governed by the |
---|
33 | 35 | | law in effect on the date the proceeding commenced, and the former |
---|
34 | 36 | | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
35 | 37 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the Senate on |
---|
39 | | - | April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
40 | | - | May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
41 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House |
---|
42 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
43 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
44 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
47 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the House, with |
---|
48 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
49 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request |
---|
50 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
51 | | - | May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
52 | | - | following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
55 | | - | Approved: |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Date |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Governor |
---|