Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB281 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 281


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of hypnotically induced statements in a
 criminal trial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.24 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.24.  STATEMENTS OBTAINED BY INVESTIGATIVE HYPNOSIS.
 (a) In this article, "investigative hypnosis" means a technique
 that uses hypnosis to explore the memory of a witness to enhance the
 witness's recall of a legally relevant event, including
 descriptions of people, conversations, and the environment.
 (b)  This article applies to all statements made during or
 after a hypnotic session by a person who has undergone
 investigative hypnosis for the purpose of enhancing the person's
 recollection of an event at issue in a criminal investigation or
 case, including courtroom testimony regarding those statements and
 including statements identifying an accused that are made pursuant
 to pretrial identification procedures.
 (c)  A statement described by Subsection (b) is not
 admissible against a defendant in a criminal trial, whether offered
 in the guilt or innocence phase or the punishment phase of the
 trial.  Notwithstanding Article 38.23, this article does not affect
 the admissibility of any physical evidence, or the testimony of any
 witness identified, that independently corroborates the crime.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that
 commences on or after the effective date of this Act.  The
 admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that
 commences before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the proceeding commenced, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor