Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021