Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB346 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2021

                            S.B. No. 346


 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of open-enrollment charter schools in
 the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 134.004, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.004.  JOBS AND EDUCATION FOR TEXANS (JET) GRANT
 PROGRAM.  (a)  The commission shall establish and administer the
 Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program to provide grants
 to public junior colleges, public technical institutes, public
 state colleges, and independent school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools described under Section 134.007
 that apply to the advisory board in the manner prescribed by the
 advisory board.  The commission shall award the grants on the advice
 and recommendations of the advisory board.
 (b)  Grants may be awarded under this chapter from the Jobs
 and Education for Texans (JET) fund to defray the start-up costs
 associated with the development of new career and technical
 education programs at public junior colleges, public technical
 institutes, public state colleges, and independent school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools described under
 Section 134.007 that meet the requirements of Section 134.006.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 134.006(a) and (d), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may award a grant for the development of
 new career and technical education courses or programs at public
 junior colleges, public technical institutes, public state
 colleges, [and] independent school districts, and open-enrollment
 charter schools.
 (d)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 public junior college, public technical institute, public state
 college, or independent school district or open-enrollment charter
 school described under Section 134.007 must provide matching funds
 in accordance with rules adopted under Section 134.008.  The
 matching funds may be obtained from any source available to the
 public junior college, public technical institute, public state
 college, [or] independent school district, or open-enrollment
 charter school, including industry consortia, community or
 foundation grants, individual contributions, and local
 governmental agency operating funds.
 SECTION 3.  Section 134.007, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.007.  GRANTS AWARDED TO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
 OR OPEN-ENROLLMENT CHARTER SCHOOL.  The commission may award a
 grant to an independent school district or open-enrollment charter
 school under this chapter if the district or school has entered into
 a partnership with a public junior college, public technical
 institute, or public state college for the purpose of:
 (1)  promoting career and technical education to the
 district's or school's students; or
 (2)  offering dual credit courses to the district's or
 school's students.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 346 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 346 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 4, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123,
 Nays 20, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor