Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021