Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2021

                            S.B. No. 44


 AN ACT
 relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain
 disaster relief organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 661, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 661.9075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 661.9075.  VOLUNTEERS OF TEXAS VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS
 ACTIVE IN DISASTER. (a) A state employee who is a volunteer of an
 organization that is a member of the Texas Voluntary Organizations
 Active in Disaster may be granted leave to participate in disaster
 relief services without a deduction in salary or loss of vacation
 time, sick leave, earned overtime credit, or state compensatory
 time if:
 (1)  the employee's supervisor authorizes the leave;
 (2)  the services in which the employee participates
 are provided for a state of disaster declared by the governor under
 Chapter 418; and
 (3)  the executive director of the employee's state
 agency approves the leave.
 (b)  Leave granted to a state employee under Subsection (a)
 may not exceed 10 days each fiscal year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 661.907, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 10, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor