Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021