Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 504


 AN ACT
 relating to authority of certain county fire marshals to inspect
 group homes; authorizing a fee; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 352.0165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.0165.  INSPECTION OF GROUP HOMES IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES; FEE. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Group home" means an establishment:
 (A)  in which three or more individuals who are
 unrelated to the owner or operator of the establishment reside;
 (B)  that provides residential care services to
 residents; and
 (C)  that receives payment or other compensation
 from a local, state, or federal governmental entity for providing
 residential care services to a resident.
 (2)  "Residential care services" means shelter,
 protection, meals, health care, mobility assistance, and personal
 care services, including bathing, dressing, and eating.
 (b)  This section applies only to a county with a population
 of 3.3 million or more.
 (c)  This section does not apply to a building owned or
 operated by:
 (1)  a person that is required to be licensed under
 Chapter 142, 242, 246, 247, or 252, Health and Safety Code;
 (2)  a person that is exempt from licensing under
 Section 142.003(a)(19), 242.003(3), or 247.004(4), Health and
 Safety Code;
 (3)  a hotel as defined by Section 156.001, Tax Code;
 (4)  a retirement community;
 (5)  a monastery or convent;
 (6)  a child-care facility as defined by Section
 42.002, Human Resources Code;
 (7)  a family violence shelter center as defined by
 Section 51.002, Human Resources Code; or
 (8)  a sorority or fraternity house or other dormitory
 associated with an institution of higher education.
 (d)  On the complaint of any person, the county fire marshal,
 at any reasonable time, may enter:
 (1)  a building in the county in which a group home is
 operated; and
 (2)  the premises of a building described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (e)  The county fire marshal shall order the removal of a
 building in which a group home is located, the removal of a
 structure located on the premises of a building in which a group
 home is located, or other remedial action if the marshal finds that:
 (1)  the building or structure, because of lack of
 repair, age, dilapidated condition, or other reason, is susceptible
 to fire and is so located or occupied that fire would endanger
 persons or property in the building or structure or on the premises
 of the building or structure;
 (2)  a dangerous condition is created by:
 (A)  an improper arrangement of stoves, ranges,
 furnaces, or other heating appliances, including chimneys, flues,
 and pipes with which they are connected, or by their lighting
 systems or devices; or
 (B)  the manner of storage of explosives,
 compounds, petroleum, gasoline, kerosene, dangerous chemicals,
 vegetable products, ashes, or combustible, flammable, or refuse
 materials; or
 (3)  any other condition exists that is dangerous or is
 liable to cause or promote fire or create danger for firefighters,
 occupants, or other buildings or structures.
 (f)  The person to whom an order under Subsection (e) is
 directed shall immediately comply with the order. The marshal may,
 if necessary, apply to a court of competent jurisdiction for writs
 or orders necessary to enforce this section, and the court may grant
 appropriate relief. The marshal is not required to give a bond.
 (g)  The commissioners court of a county may adopt any
 appropriate standard developed by a nationally recognized
 standards-making association under which the county fire marshal
 may enforce this section, except that standards adopted under this
 subsection do not apply in a municipality that has adopted fire
 protection ordinances.
 (h)  The commissioners court of a county shall prescribe a
 reasonable fee for an inspection performed by the county fire
 marshal that may be charged to a property owner or occupant who
 requests the inspection, as the commissioners court considers
 appropriate. In prescribing the fee, the commissioners court shall
 consider the overall cost to the marshal to perform the
 inspections, including the approximate amount of time the staff of
 the marshal needs to perform an inspection, travel costs, and other
 expenses.
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.022.  PENALTY FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER. An
 owner or occupant who is subject to an order issued under Section
 352.016 or 352.0165 commits an offense if that person fails to
 comply with the order. Each refusal to comply is a separate
 offense. The offense is a Class B misdemeanor unless it is shown on
 the trial of the offense that the defendant has been previously
 convicted two or more times under this section, in which event the
 offense is a state jail felony.
 SECTION 3.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an offense committed on or
 after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 504 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 504 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110,
 Nays 37, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor