House | 05/23/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |