Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021