House
|
05/30/2021
|
Point of order overruled Rule 13, Section 9(a)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2007
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 547
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Corrected Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#848
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#841
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 20-Beckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 19-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 18-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 17-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 16-Vo
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 15-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 14-Klick
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 13-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 12-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 11-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 10-Minjarez
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 9-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 8-Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 7-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 6-Murr
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 5-Cain and Schofield
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 4-Cain and Schofield
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 3-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 2-J.D. Johnson and Cain
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Postponed 5/6/21 11:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-J.D. Johnson and Cain
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#838
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA22 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA31 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA18 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA30 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA17 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA29 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA28 Alvarado
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA27 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA26 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA25 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA24 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA23 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA22 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA21 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA20 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA19 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA18 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA17 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA16 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA15 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA14 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA13 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Powell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Record vote FA2 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amended FA2 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA3 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Tagged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|