Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021