4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory |
---|
6 | 8 | | committee. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | 11 | | is amended by adding Section 21.004 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 21.004. URBAN AIR MOBILITY ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) |
---|
11 | 13 | | The commission shall appoint an advisory committee to assess |
---|
12 | 14 | | current state law and any potential changes to state law that are |
---|
13 | 15 | | needed to facilitate the development of urban air mobility |
---|
14 | 16 | | operations and infrastructure in this state. |
---|
15 | 17 | | (b) The commission shall appoint to the advisory committee |
---|
16 | 18 | | members to represent: |
---|
17 | 19 | | (1) diverse geographic regions of the state; |
---|
18 | 20 | | (2) state and local law enforcement; |
---|
19 | 21 | | (3) the urban air mobility industry; |
---|
20 | 22 | | (4) transportation experts; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) The advisory committee shall: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) hold public hearings in locations across the state |
---|
27 | 27 | | or via electronic means; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) receive comments through an Internet website, by |
---|
29 | 29 | | mail, and by other methods, if appropriate. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (d) Not later than September 1, 2022, the advisory committee |
---|
31 | 31 | | shall report to the commission and to the members of the legislature |
---|
32 | 32 | | the committee's findings and recommendations on any changes to |
---|
33 | 33 | | state law that are needed to facilitate the development of urban air |
---|
34 | 34 | | mobility operations and infrastructure. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (e) The advisory committee is abolished and this section |
---|
36 | 36 | | expires January 1, 2023. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
38 | 38 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
39 | 39 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
40 | 40 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
41 | 41 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 763 passed the Senate on |
---|
45 | | - | April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that |
---|
46 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the |
---|
47 | | - | following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 763 passed the House, with |
---|
51 | | - | amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, |
---|
52 | | - | Nays 33, two present not voting. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
55 | | - | Approved: |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Date |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Governor |
---|