Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB763 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2021

                            S.B. No. 763


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory
 committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 21.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.004.  URBAN AIR MOBILITY ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a)
 The commission shall appoint an advisory committee to assess
 current state law and any potential changes to state law that are
 needed to facilitate the development of urban air mobility
 operations and infrastructure in this state.
 (b)  The commission shall appoint to the advisory committee
 members to represent:
 (1)  diverse geographic regions of the state;
 (2)  state and local law enforcement;
 (3)  the urban air mobility industry;
 (4)  transportation experts;
 (5)  commercial airport representatives;
 (6)  vertical takeoff and landing operators;
 (7)  local governments; and
 (8)  the general public.
 (c)  The advisory committee shall:
 (1)  hold public hearings in locations across the state
 or via electronic means; and
 (2)  receive comments through an Internet website, by
 mail, and by other methods, if appropriate.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the advisory committee
 shall report to the commission and to the members of the legislature
 the committee's findings and recommendations on any changes to
 state law that are needed to facilitate the development of urban air
 mobility operations and infrastructure.
 (e)  The advisory committee is abolished and this section
 expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 763 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 763 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110,
 Nays 33, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor