Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB763 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021