Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021