Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021