Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 790


 AN ACT
 relating to county and municipal authority to balance bill for
 county or municipal air or ground ambulance services and to a study
 regarding billing by ground ambulance service providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 113.902(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 140.013, the [The] county
 treasurer shall direct prosecution for the recovery of any debt
 owed to the county, as provided by law, and shall supervise the
 collection of the debt.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 140.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 140.013.  BALANCE BILLING FOR COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL
 AMBULANCE SERVICES. (a)  "Balance billing" means the practice of
 charging an enrollee in a health benefit plan to recover from the
 enrollee the balance of a health care provider's fee for a service
 received by the enrollee from the health care provider that is not
 fully reimbursed by the enrollee's health benefit plan.
 (b)  A county or municipality may elect to consider a health
 benefit plan payment towards a claim for air or ground ambulance
 services provided by the county or municipality as payment in full
 for those services regardless of the amount the county or
 municipality charged for those services.
 (c)  A county or municipality may not practice balance
 billing for a claim for which the county or municipality makes an
 election under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  (a)  In this section, "department" means the
 Texas Department of Insurance.
 (b)  The department shall conduct a study on the balance
 billing practices of ground ambulance service providers, the
 variations in prices for ground ambulance services, the proportion
 of ground ambulances that are in-network, trends in network
 inclusion, and factors contributing to the network status of ground
 ambulances.  The department may seek the assistance of the
 Department of State Health Services in conducting the study.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the department shall
 provide a written report of the results of the study conducted under
 Subsection (b) of this section to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and members of
 the standing committees of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over the department.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117,
 Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor