15 | | - | SECTION 2. Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended |
---|
16 | | - | by adding Section 140.013 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | | - | Sec. 140.013. BALANCE BILLING FOR COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL |
---|
18 | | - | AMBULANCE SERVICES. (a) "Balance billing" means the practice of |
---|
19 | | - | charging an enrollee in a health benefit plan to recover from the |
---|
20 | | - | enrollee the balance of a health care provider's fee for a service |
---|
21 | | - | received by the enrollee from the health care provider that is not |
---|
22 | | - | fully reimbursed by the enrollee's health benefit plan. |
---|
23 | | - | (b) A county or municipality may elect to consider a health |
---|
24 | | - | benefit plan payment towards a claim for air or ground ambulance |
---|
25 | | - | services provided by the county or municipality as payment in full |
---|
26 | | - | for those services regardless of the amount the county or |
---|
27 | | - | municipality charged for those services. |
---|
28 | | - | (c) A county or municipality may not practice balance |
---|
29 | | - | billing for a claim for which the county or municipality makes an |
---|
30 | | - | election under Subsection (b). |
---|
31 | | - | SECTION 3. (a) In this section, "department" means the |
---|
32 | | - | Texas Department of Insurance. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) The department shall conduct a study on the balance |
---|
34 | | - | billing practices of ground ambulance service providers, the |
---|
35 | | - | variations in prices for ground ambulance services, the proportion |
---|
36 | | - | of ground ambulances that are in-network, trends in network |
---|
37 | | - | inclusion, and factors contributing to the network status of ground |
---|
38 | | - | ambulances. The department may seek the assistance of the |
---|
39 | | - | Department of State Health Services in conducting the study. |
---|
40 | | - | (c) Not later than December 1, 2022, the department shall |
---|
41 | | - | provide a written report of the results of the study conducted under |
---|
42 | | - | Subsection (b) of this section to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
43 | | - | governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and members of |
---|
44 | | - | the standing committees of the legislature with primary |
---|
45 | | - | jurisdiction over the department. |
---|
46 | | - | (d) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
47 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the Senate on |
---|
51 | | - | April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the |
---|
52 | | - | Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2021, by the |
---|
53 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the House, with |
---|
57 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117, |
---|
58 | | - | Nays 26, two present not voting. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | | - | Approved: |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Date |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 16 | + | SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 113, Local Government |
---|
| 17 | + | Code, is amended by adding Section 113.9025 to read as follows: |
---|
| 18 | + | Sec. 113.9025. BALANCE BILLING FOR COUNTY AIR AMBULANCE |
---|
| 19 | + | SERVICES. (a) "Balance billing" means the practice of charging an |
---|
| 20 | + | enrollee in a health benefit plan to recover from the enrollee the |
---|
| 21 | + | balance of a health care provider's fee for a service received by |
---|
| 22 | + | the enrollee from the health care provider that is not fully |
---|
| 23 | + | reimbursed by the enrollee's health benefit plan. |
---|
| 24 | + | (b) A county may elect to consider a health benefit plan |
---|
| 25 | + | payment towards a claim for air ambulance services provided by the |
---|
| 26 | + | county as payment in full for those services regardless of the |
---|
| 27 | + | amount the county charged for those services. |
---|
| 28 | + | (c) A county may not practice balance billing for a claim |
---|
| 29 | + | for which the county makes an election under Subsection (b). |
---|
| 30 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|