Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB792 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 792
1+By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 792
2+ (Cortez)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to specialty license plates and parking placards for
68 vehicles of certain disabled veterans.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Section 502.410(b), Transportation Code, is
911 amended to read as follows:
1012 (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to a statement or
1113 application filed or given under Section 502.060, 502.092, 502.093,
1214 502.094, 502.095, 504.201, 504.202(b-1), 504.508, or 504.515.
1315 SECTION 2. Section 504.202, Transportation Code, is amended
1416 by adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (k) and amending
1517 Subsections (g) and (j) to read as follows:
1618 (b-1) A person described by Subsection (b) who is eligible
1719 to receive license plates under Section 504.201 may elect to
1820 receive license plates under this section that include the symbol
1921 described by Section 504.201(f). The initial application for
2022 license plates under this subsection must be accompanied by:
2123 (1) the written statement required by Section
2224 504.201(d), unless the applicant is an organization described by
2325 Subsection (b-2); and
2426 (2) any other information required for an application
2527 under this section.
2628 (b-2) An organization that registers a motor vehicle under
2729 Subsection (c) may elect to receive license plates under Subsection
2830 (b-1) if the vehicle regularly transports veterans who are eligible
2931 to receive license plates under Subsection (b-1). The department
3032 shall adopt rules prescribing satisfactory proof of eligibility
3133 under this subsection.
3234 (g) A person who receives license plates under Subsection
3335 (b-1) [this section] may receive a disabled parking placard under
3436 Section 681.004 for each set of license plates [without providing
3537 additional documentation].
3638 (j) A person entitled to license plates under this section
3739 may instead use, for a vehicle that meets the requirements of
3840 Section 504.501 or 504.502, disabled veteran license plates issued
3941 by this state that [are]:
4042 (1) are embossed with an alphanumeric pattern;
4143 (2) are of a plate design that was issued in the same
4244 year as the model year of the vehicle; [and]
4345 (3) are approved for use by the department; and
4446 (4) include the symbol described by Section
4547 504.201(f), if the person satisfies the requirements for the
4648 issuance of license plates under Subsection (b-1) and elects to
4749 include the symbol on the plates.
4850 (k) A reference in law to license plates issued under
4951 Subsection (b-1) includes disabled veteran license plates
5052 described by Subsection (j)(4).
5153 SECTION 3. Section 681.004(a), Transportation Code, is
5254 amended to read as follows:
5355 (a) A person with a permanent disability may receive:
5456 (1) two disabled parking placards, if the person does
5557 not receive a set of special license plates under Section 504.201;
5658 (2) one disabled parking placard, if the person
5759 receives a set of special license plates under Section 504.201; or
5860 (3) two disabled parking placards, if the person
5961 receives two sets of special license plates under Section
6062 504.202(b-1) [504.202].
6163 SECTION 4. Section 681.008(a), Transportation Code, is
6264 amended to read as follows:
6365 (a) A vehicle may be parked for an unlimited period in a
6466 parking space or area that is designated specifically for persons
6567 with physical disabilities if [the vehicle]:
6668 (1) the vehicle [is being operated by or for the
6769 transportation of]:
6870 (A) [the person who registered the vehicle under
6971 Section 504.202(a) or a person described by Section 504.202(b) if
7072 the vehicle is registered under that subsection; and
7173 [(B)] displays special license plates issued
7274 under Section 504.202(b-1) [504.202]; and
7375 (B) is being operated by or for the
7476 transportation of the person to whom the plates were issued; or
7577 (2) the vehicle displays license plates issued by
7678 another state of the United States that indicate on the face of the
7779 license plates that the owner or operator of the vehicle is a
7880 disabled veteran of the United States armed forces.
7981 SECTION 5. Section 681.009(e), Transportation Code, is
8082 amended to read as follows:
8183 (e) Parking spaces or areas designated for the exclusive use
8284 of vehicles transporting persons with disabilities may be used by
8385 vehicles displaying a white on blue shield disabled parking
8486 placard, license plates issued under Section 504.201 or
8587 504.202(b-1) [504.202], or a white on red shield disabled parking
8688 placard.
8789 SECTION 6. Sections 681.011(a), (b), and (l),
8890 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
8991 (a) A person commits an offense if:
9092 (1) the person stands a vehicle on which are displayed
9193 license plates issued under Section 504.201 or 504.202(b-1)
9294 [504.202] or a disabled parking placard in a parking space or area
9395 designated specifically for persons with disabilities by:
9496 (A) a political subdivision; or
9597 (B) a person who owns or controls private
9698 property used for parking as to which a political subdivision has
9799 provided for the application of this section under Subsection (f);
98100 and
99101 (2) the standing of the vehicle in that parking space
100102 or area is not authorized by Section 681.006, 681.007, or 681.008.
101103 (b) A person commits an offense if the person stands a
102104 vehicle on which license plates issued under Section 504.201 or
103105 504.202(b-1) [504.202] are not displayed and a disabled parking
104106 placard is not displayed in a parking space or area designated
105107 specifically for individuals with disabilities by:
106108 (1) a political subdivision; or
107109 (2) a person who owns or controls private property
108110 used for parking as to which a political subdivision has provided
109111 for the application of this section under Subsection (f).
110112 (l) A person commits an offense if the person:
111113 (1) stands a vehicle on which are displayed license
112114 plates issued under Section 504.201 or 504.202(b-1) or a disabled
113115 parking placard in a parking space or area for which this chapter
114116 creates an exemption from payment of a fee or penalty imposed by a
115117 governmental unit;
116118 (2) does not have a disability;
117119 (3) is not transporting a person with disability; and
118120 (4) does not pay any applicable fee related to
119121 standing in the space or area imposed by a governmental unit or
120122 exceeds a limitation on the length of time for standing in the space
121123 or area.
122124 SECTION 7. Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
123125 Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt rules for issuing
124126 specialty license plates under Section 504.202(b-1),
125127 Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
126128 SECTION 8. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
127129 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
128130 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
129131 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
130132 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
131133 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
132134 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
133135 SECTION 9. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
134136 section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
135137 (b) Section 7 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
136- ______________________________ ______________________________
137- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
138- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 792 passed the Senate on
139- April 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
140- ______________________________
141- Secretary of the Senate
142- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 792 passed the House on
143- May 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 1, two present
144- not voting.
145- ______________________________
146- Chief Clerk of the House
147- Approved:
148- ______________________________
149- Date
150- ______________________________
151- Governor