Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB792 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2021

                            S.B. No. 792


 AN ACT
 relating to specialty license plates and parking placards for
 vehicles of certain disabled veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.410(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a statement or
 application filed or given under Section 502.060, 502.092, 502.093,
 502.094, 502.095, 504.201, 504.202(b-1), 504.508, or 504.515.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.202, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (k) and amending
 Subsections (g) and (j) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A person described by Subsection (b) who is eligible
 to receive license plates under Section 504.201 may elect to
 receive license plates under this section that include the symbol
 described by Section 504.201(f). The initial application for
 license plates under this subsection must be accompanied by:
 (1)  the written statement required by Section
 504.201(d), unless the applicant is an organization described by
 Subsection (b-2); and
 (2)  any other information required for an application
 under this section.
 (b-2)  An organization that registers a motor vehicle under
 Subsection (c) may elect to receive license plates under Subsection
 (b-1) if the vehicle regularly transports veterans who are eligible
 to receive license plates under Subsection (b-1). The department
 shall adopt rules prescribing satisfactory proof of eligibility
 under this subsection.
 (g)  A person who receives license plates under Subsection
 (b-1) [this section] may receive a disabled parking placard under
 Section 681.004 for each set of license plates [without providing
 additional documentation].
 (j)  A person entitled to license plates under this section
 may instead use, for a vehicle that meets the requirements of
 Section 504.501 or 504.502, disabled veteran license plates issued
 by this state that [are]:
 (1)  are embossed with an alphanumeric pattern;
 (2)  are of a plate design that was issued in the same
 year as the model year of the vehicle; [and]
 (3)  are approved for use by the department; and
 (4)  include the symbol described by Section
 504.201(f), if the person satisfies the requirements for the
 issuance of license plates under Subsection (b-1) and elects to
 include the symbol on the plates.
 (k)  A reference in law to license plates issued under
 Subsection (b-1) includes disabled veteran license plates
 described by Subsection (j)(4).
 SECTION 3.  Section 681.004(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person with a permanent disability may receive:
 (1)  two disabled parking placards, if the person does
 not receive a set of special license plates under Section 504.201;
 (2)  one disabled parking placard, if the person
 receives a set of special license plates under Section 504.201; or
 (3)  two disabled parking placards, if the person
 receives two sets of special license plates under Section
 504.202(b-1) [504.202].
 SECTION 4.  Section 681.008(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A vehicle may be parked for an unlimited period in a
 parking space or area that is designated specifically for persons
 with physical disabilities if [the vehicle]:
 (1)  the vehicle [is being operated by or for the
 transportation of]:
 (A)  [the person who registered the vehicle under
 Section 504.202(a) or a person described by Section 504.202(b) if
 the vehicle is registered under that subsection; and
 [(B)]  displays special license plates issued
 under Section 504.202(b-1) [504.202]; and
 (B)  is being operated by or for the
 transportation of the person to whom the plates were issued; or
 (2)  the vehicle displays license plates issued by
 another state of the United States that indicate on the face of the
 license plates that the owner or operator of the vehicle is a
 disabled veteran of the United States armed forces.
 SECTION 5.  Section 681.009(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Parking spaces or areas designated for the exclusive use
 of vehicles transporting persons with disabilities may be used by
 vehicles displaying a white on blue shield disabled parking
 placard, license plates issued under Section 504.201 or
 504.202(b-1) [504.202], or a white on red shield disabled parking
 placard.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 681.011(a), (b), and (l),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if:
 (1)  the person stands a vehicle on which are displayed
 license plates issued under Section 504.201 or 504.202(b-1)
 [504.202] or a disabled parking placard in a parking space or area
 designated specifically for persons with disabilities by:
 (A)  a political subdivision; or
 (B)  a person who owns or controls private
 property used for parking as to which a political subdivision has
 provided for the application of this section under Subsection (f);
 and
 (2)  the standing of the vehicle in that parking space
 or area is not authorized by Section 681.006, 681.007, or 681.008.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person stands a
 vehicle on which license plates issued under Section 504.201 or
 504.202(b-1) [504.202] are not displayed and a disabled parking
 placard is not displayed in a parking space or area designated
 specifically for individuals with disabilities by:
 (1)  a political subdivision; or
 (2)  a person who owns or controls private property
 used for parking as to which a political subdivision has provided
 for the application of this section under Subsection (f).
 (l)  A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1)  stands a vehicle on which are displayed license
 plates issued under Section 504.201 or 504.202(b-1) or a disabled
 parking placard in a parking space or area for which this chapter
 creates an exemption from payment of a fee or penalty imposed by a
 governmental unit;
 (2)  does not have a disability;
 (3)  is not transporting a person with disability; and
 (4)  does not pay any applicable fee related to
 standing in the space or area imposed by a governmental unit or
 exceeds a limitation on the length of time for standing in the space
 or area.
 SECTION 7.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt rules for issuing
 specialty license plates under Section 504.202(b-1),
 Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 9.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 (b)  Section 7 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 792 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 792 passed the House on
 May 8, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 1, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor