Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021