4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to health care institution reporting of federal money |
---|
6 | 10 | | received for the coronavirus disease public health emergency. |
---|
7 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 13 | | amended by adding Chapter 81A to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 14 | | CHAPTER 81A. CORONAVIRUS DISEASE PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY REPORTING |
---|
11 | 15 | | Sec. 81A.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: |
---|
12 | 16 | | (1) "Coronavirus disease public health emergency" |
---|
13 | 17 | | means the period: |
---|
14 | 18 | | (A) beginning on the date the public health |
---|
15 | 19 | | emergency declared by the United States secretary of health and |
---|
16 | 20 | | human services under Section 319, Public Health Service Act (42 |
---|
17 | 21 | | U.S.C. Section 247d), on January 31, 2020, with respect to the |
---|
18 | 22 | | coronavirus disease (COVID-19) took effect; and |
---|
19 | 23 | | (B) ending on the earlier of: |
---|
20 | 24 | | (i) the date the public health emergency |
---|
21 | 25 | | described by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision ends; or |
---|
22 | 26 | | (ii) January 1, 2023. |
---|
23 | 27 | | (2) "Health care institution" has the meaning assigned |
---|
24 | 28 | | by Section 74.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code. |
---|
25 | 29 | | Sec. 81A.002. HEALTH CARE INSTITUTION REPORT. (a) Except |
---|
26 | 30 | | as provided by Subsection (b), and subject to Subsection (d), a |
---|
27 | 31 | | health care institution that receives federal money for assisting |
---|
28 | 32 | | health care institutions during the coronavirus disease public |
---|
29 | 33 | | health emergency, including money received under the Coronavirus |
---|
30 | 34 | | Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Section 9001 et |
---|
31 | 35 | | seq.), the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 (Pub. L. |
---|
32 | 36 | | No. 116-260), and the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 (Pub. L. |
---|
33 | 37 | | No. 117-2), shall report the money received to the commission on a |
---|
34 | 38 | | monthly basis. A health care institution's initial report to the |
---|
35 | 39 | | commission must include all federal money received by the |
---|
36 | 40 | | institution during the period beginning January 31, 2020, and |
---|
37 | 41 | | ending August 31, 2021. |
---|
38 | 42 | | (b) A health care institution is not required to report |
---|
39 | 43 | | federal money: |
---|
40 | 44 | | (1) received as a loan during the coronavirus disease |
---|
41 | 45 | | public health emergency from the United States Small Business |
---|
42 | 46 | | Administration as part of a paycheck protection program; or |
---|
43 | 47 | | (2) received under Subsection (a) if the health care |
---|
44 | 48 | | institution returned or repaid the money to the federal government. |
---|
45 | 49 | | (c) Each quarter, the commission shall compile the |
---|
46 | 50 | | information described by Subsection (a) into a written report |
---|
47 | 51 | | provided to: |
---|
48 | 52 | | (1) the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of |
---|
49 | 53 | | the house of representatives; |
---|
50 | 54 | | (2) the Legislative Budget Board; and |
---|
51 | 55 | | (3) the standing committees of the legislature with |
---|
52 | 56 | | primary jurisdiction over state finance and public health. |
---|
53 | 57 | | (d) The commission shall establish procedures for health |
---|
54 | 58 | | care institutions to report the information required under |
---|
55 | 59 | | Subsection (a). In establishing the procedures, the commission |
---|
56 | 60 | | shall to the extent practicable: |
---|
57 | 61 | | (1) minimize duplication of reporting by institutions |
---|
58 | 62 | | to the commission; and |
---|
59 | 63 | | (2) avoid requiring institutions to report |
---|
60 | 64 | | information that is duplicative of information that institutions |
---|
61 | 65 | | are required to report to the federal government. |
---|
62 | 66 | | Sec. 81A.003. DISCIPLINARY ACTION BY LICENSING AUTHORITY. |
---|
63 | 67 | | The appropriate licensing authority may take disciplinary action |
---|
64 | 68 | | against a health care institution that violates this chapter as if |
---|
65 | 69 | | the institution violated an applicable licensing law. |
---|
66 | 70 | | Sec. 81A.004. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September |
---|
67 | 71 | | 1, 2023. |
---|
68 | 72 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
71 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 809 passed the Senate on |
---|
72 | | - | March 31, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
73 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the |
---|
74 | | - | following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
75 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
76 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
77 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 809 passed the House, with |
---|
78 | | - | amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136, |
---|
79 | | - | Nays 1, two present not voting. |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
82 | | - | Approved: |
---|
83 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | | - | Date |
---|
85 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | | - | Governor |
---|